WI AJR9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing March 1, 2019, as National Speech and Debate Education Day in Wisconsin.
Title
Recognizing March 1, 2019, as National Speech and Debate Education Day in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Representative Meyers added as a coauthor |
2019-02-22 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr9 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR9.pdf |