WI AJR83 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Enrolled on November 18 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Report correctly enrolled on 11-18-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 18 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Report correctly enrolled on 11-18-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing November 2015 as Prematurity Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing November 2015 as Prematurity Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-18-2015 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Senator Darling added as a cosponsor |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-11-03 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-03 | House | Adopted |
2015-11-03 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2015-11-03 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-11-03 | House | Introduced |