WI AJR8 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 34 of article IV of the constitution; relating to: continuity of government (second consideration).
Title
Continuity of government (second consideration).
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Sen. Randy Hopper [R] | Sen. Bob Jauch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-08-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-08-02 | House | Report adoption as amended recommended by committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2011-08-02 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2011-04-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-04-06 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2011-03-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-02-02 | House | Read and referred to committee on Homeland Security and State Affairs |
2011-02-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr8 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AJR8.pdf |