WI AJR8 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 1 of article VIII of the constitution; relating to: taxation of principal homesteads of individuals (first consideration).
Title
Taxation of principal homesteads of individuals (first consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-20 | Made a special order of business at 11:01 A.M. on 4-22-2010 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-07 | Report adoption as amended recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 6, Noes 3 | |
2010-04-07 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 6, Noes 3 | |
2010-04-06 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-03 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Sherman | |
2010-01-21 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-05 | Read first time and referred to committee on Ways and Means | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr8 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AJR8.pdf |