WI AJR67 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 4 (2) of article VII of the constitution; Relating to: election of chief justice (first consideration).
Title
Election of chief justice (first consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-12 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:02 PM on 11-14-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-04 | House | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2013-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-10-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr67 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AJR67.pdf |