WI AJR67 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-13-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-03 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-03 - Report correctly enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: National Adoption Month.
Title
National Adoption Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled |
2011-11-03 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-11-02 | Senate | Concurred in |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-2-2011 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-25 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-25 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2011-10-25 | House | Adopted |
2011-10-25 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2011-10-20 | House | Placed on calendar 10-25-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-18 | House | Read and referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-18 | House | Introduced |