WI AJR60 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring the career and accomplishments of Barry Alvarez.
Title
Honoring the career and accomplishments of Barry Alvarez.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-17 | House | Representative Schraa added as a coauthor |
2021-06-11 | House | Representatives Tusler, Spiros and Callahan added as coauthors |
2021-06-07 | House | Representatives Baldeh, Kurtz and Wittke added as coauthors |
2021-06-03 | House | Read and referred to calendar |
2021-06-03 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2021/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr60 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2021/REG/AJR60.pdf |