WI AJR60 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Enrolled on October 22 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-22 - Report correctly enrolled on 10-22-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 22 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-22 - Report correctly enrolled on 10-22-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming September 2015 as Charcot-Marie-Tooth Disease Awareness Month.
Title
Proclaiming September 2015 as Charcot-Marie-Tooth Disease Awareness Month.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-22-2015 |
2015-10-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Concurred in |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-20-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-09-24 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-09-24 | House | Adopted |
2015-09-22 | House | Placed on calendar 9-24-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-09-18 | House | Introduced |