WI AJR51 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-23 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-23 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: recognizing the value and need for employment services for individuals with developmental disabilities.
Title
Recognizing the value and need for employment services for individuals with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017 |
2017-06-16 | House | Representative VanderMeer added as a coauthor |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | House | Adopted |
2017-06-14 | House | Representative Felzkowski added as a coauthor |
2017-06-09 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2017-06-07 | House | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-16 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced |