WI AJR48 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-13)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Report correctly enrolled on 5-18-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: recognizing Asian Pacific Islander Desi American (APIDA) Heritage Month as a time to honor the important contributions of Asians, Asian Americans, Pacific Islanders, and Desi Americans to the history of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing Asian Pacific Islander Desi American (APIDA) Heritage Month as a time to honor the important contributions of Asians, Asian Americans, Pacific Islanders, and Desi Americans to the history of the United States.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseReport correctly enrolled on 5-18-2021
2021-05-11HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2021-05-11SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11SenateConcurred in
2021-05-11SenateRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
2021-05-11SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2021-05-11SenateReceived from Assembly
2021-05-11HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2021-05-11HouseAdopted
2021-05-11HouseRepresentative McGuire added as a coauthor
2021-05-06HousePlaced on calendar 5-11-2021 by Committee on Rules
2021-05-04HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2021-05-04HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback