WI AJR48 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-5)
Status: Enrolled on October 11 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-11 - Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 11 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-11 - Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: supporting atomic veterans, their spouses, and dependents in receiving medical care and disability compensation.
Title
Supporting atomic veterans, their spouses, and dependents in receiving medical care and disability compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 10-11-2019 |
2019-10-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-10-08 | Senate | Concurred in |
2019-10-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-8-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-06-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-06-18 | House | Adopted |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-03 | House | Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor |
2019-06-03 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2019-05-24 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-05-24 | House | Introduced |