WI AJR43 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-23 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-23 - Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming May 12, 2017, as Lorine Niedecker Day in the state of Wisconsin.
Title
Proclaiming May 12, 2017, as Lorine Niedecker Day in the state of Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-23-2017 |
2017-06-14 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Concurred in |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-14-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-05-10 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-05-10 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-05-03 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-05-03 | House | Introduced |