WI AJR4 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4)
Status: Passed on March 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: reaffirming Wisconsin's commitment to the strengthening and deepening of the sister ties between the State of Wisconsin and Taiwan; supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA) with the United States; and continuing support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.
Title
Reaffirming Wisconsin's commitment to the strengthening and deepening of the sister ties between the State of Wisconsin and Taiwan; supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement (BTA) with the United States; and continuing support for increasing Taiwan's international profile.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-24-2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Concurred in |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-22-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Roys added as a cosponsor |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-01-19 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-01-19 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-19 | House | Representatives Allen, August, Subeck and Edming added as coauthors |
2023-01-18 | House | Senator Jacque added as a cosponsor |
2023-01-17 | House | Placed on calendar 1-19-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-01-17 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced |