WI AJR31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: recognizing September 1 to 7, 2019, as Resiliency Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing September 1 to 7, 2019, as Resiliency Week.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-17HouseRepresentative Vining added as a coauthor
2019-06-13HousePlaced on calendar 6-18-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-04-25HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2019-04-25HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback