WI AJR26 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-09 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: the life and public service of Dave Donnellan.
Title
The life and public service of Dave Donnellan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 25 |
2014-06-09 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 6-6-2014 |
2013-06-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-21-2013 |
2013-06-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Concurred in |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-18-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-06-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-13 | House | Adopted |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed on calendar 6-13-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-04-25 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-04-25 | House | Introduced |