WI AJR26 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend so as in effect to repeal section 2 of article VI; to amend section 8 of article V, section 1 of article VI, section 3 of article VI, sections 7 and 8 of article X and section 4 of article XIII; and to create section 17 of article XIV of the constitution; relating to: deleting from the constitution the offices of secretary of state and state treasurer (first consideration).
Title
Deleting from the constitution the offices of secretary of state and state treasurer (first consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-01-26 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2011-10-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-12 | House | Report adoption recommended by committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2011-09-29 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-08-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-04-12 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Ethics |
2011-04-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr26 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AJR26.pdf |