WI AJR22 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: honoring April 22, 2023, as the 53rd anniversary of Earth Day.
Title
Honoring April 22, 2023, as the 53rd anniversary of Earth Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-04-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-04-18 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-13 | House | Placed on calendar 4-18-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-03-24 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-03-24 | House | Introduced |