WI AJR16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming May 19, 20, and 21, 2017, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Title
Proclaiming May 19, 20, and 21, 2017, Syttende Mai Weekend.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-05-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-10 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on calendar 5-10-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-03-10 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr16 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AJR16.pdf |