WI AJR110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Enrolled on January 27 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Report correctly enrolled on 1-27-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: recognizing The American Legion's ongoing commitment to service to veterans, families, the nation, the state, and their communities and commending the Legion on the occasion of its century of service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing The American Legion's ongoing commitment to service to veterans, families, the nation, the state, and their communities and commending the Legion on the occasion of its century of service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27HouseReport correctly enrolled on 1-27-2020
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateConcurred in
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-16SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-01-15SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-01-15HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-15HouseRepresentative Ott added as a coauthor
2020-01-15HouseAdopted
2020-01-13HousePlaced on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules
2019-12-05HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2019-12-05HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback