WI AJR109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: recognizing February 2018 as Black History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing February 2018 as Black History Month.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-03-12SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-03-12SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-23SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-22HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-22HouseAdopted
2018-02-20HousePlaced on calendar 2-22-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-02-16HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-16HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback