WI AJR107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-13)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to: the life and public service of Representative Robert "Bob" Gannon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The life and public service of Representative Robert "Bob" Gannon.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseNot published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 18
2018-03-07HouseDeposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 3-7-2018
2018-02-21HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-21-2018
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateConcurred in by unanimous rising vote
2018-02-20SenateRead
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
2018-02-20SenateRead and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-20SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20HouseRepresentatives Pronschinske, Barca and Shankland added as coauthors
2018-02-20HouseAdopted
2018-02-15HousePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-02-14HouseRead and referred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback