WI AJR101 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-21-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-21 - Report correctly enrolled on 2-21-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming April 2018 as Wisconsin Lions Eyeglass Recycling Month in Wisconsin.
Title
Proclaiming April 2018 as Wisconsin Lions Eyeglass Recycling Month in Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-21-2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Concurred in |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Representatives Shankland and Barca added as coauthors |
2018-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-30 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-30 | House | Introduced |