WI AJR100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 26 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: encouraging the use of television white space technology to increase access to the Internet.
Title
Encouraging the use of television white space technology to increase access to the Internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on calendar 2-22-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-26 | House | Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor |
2018-01-23 | House | Read and referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | Introduced |