WI AJR1 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: public access to the state capitol building.
Title
Public access to the state capitol building.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Vos [R] | Rep. Jim Steineke [R] | Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] |
Sen. Chris Kapenga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 2 |
2021-02-09 | House | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 2-9-2021 |
2021-01-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-12-2021 |
2021-01-05 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Concurred in |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-01-04 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-01-04 | House | Adopted |
2021-01-04 | House | Privileged and read |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced |