WI AJR1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To renumber and amend section 9m of article I; and to create section 9m (1) of article I, section 9m (4) of article I, section 9m (5) of article I and section 9m (6) of article I of the constitution; Relating to: the rights of crime victims (second consideration).
Title
The rights of crime victims (second consideration).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Novak |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Report adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2019-02-01 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/joint_resolution/ajr1 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AJR1.pdf |