WI AJR1 | 2011 | January Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - Not published
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-07 - Not published
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: modifying the session schedule for the 2011-12 biennial session period and extending the floorperiod beginning on February 22, 2011.
Title
Modifying the session schedule for the 2011-12 biennial session period and extending the floorperiod beginning on February 22, 2011.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Concurred in (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Not published | |
2011-05-26 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 5-26-2011. Enrolled Joint Resolution 5 | |
2011-03-03 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2011-02-24 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-02-24 | Concurred in, Ayes 19, Noes 0 | |
2011-02-24 | Rules suspended and taken up | |
2011-02-24 | Available for scheduling | |
2011-02-24 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Assembly | |
2011-02-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Privileged and read | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced |