WI AB994 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 101.654 (3); to amend 101.654 (1m) (b) 1.; and to create 101.654 (1m) (f), 101.654 (3) (a) 1., 101.654 (3) (a) 2. and 101.654 (3) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: certification requirements for building contractors. (FE)
Title
Certification requirements for building contractors. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Shae Sortwell [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] |
Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] |
Sen. John Jagler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 237 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-10-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:20 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2022-02-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced |