WI AB964 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 79.05 (2) (c); and to create 20.370 (6) (ad), 66.0602 (3) (e) 10., 71.07 (8g), 71.10 (4) (em), 196.37 (6), 281.61 (8) (c), 281.62 (1) (am) and 281.62 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: providing funding, creating an individual income tax credit, and providing a levy limit exception for lead service line replacement and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Providing funding, creating an individual income tax credit, and providing a levy limit exception for lead service line replacement and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab964 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB964.pdf |