WI AB946 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.115 (7) (qf) of the statutes; and to affect 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, section 9133 (1); Relating to: producer led watershed protection grants and transferring moneys within the environmental fund. (FE)
Title
Producer led watershed protection grants and transferring moneys within the environmental fund. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] |
Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Sen. Patrick Testin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 196 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Representatives Pronschinske and Shankland added as coauthors |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:29 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 27 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced |