WI AB943 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (4) (hs) and 287.17 (12) of the statutes; Relating to: cleanup of electronics recycling waste and making an appropriation.
Title
Cleanup of electronics recycling waste and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. James Edming [R] | Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. Beth Meyers [D] | Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] |
Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 234 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-11 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-11-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:10 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Environment and referred to committee on State Affairs pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced |