WI AB938 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (b) 57. and 71.05 (6) (b) 58. of the statutes; Relating to: an income tax subtraction for overtime wages and certain bonuses. (FE)
Title
An income tax subtraction for overtime wages and certain bonuses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-01-17 | House | Senator Ballweg added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced |