WI AB927 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 138.14 (10) (a) 1.; to amend 138.14 (13) (d) and 422.201 (3); and to create 138.14 (10) (a) 1g. of the statutes; Relating to: interest rates on payday loans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interest rates on payday loans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-20HouseRepresentative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
2024-02-01HouseRepresentative Stubbs added as a coauthor
2024-01-12HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2024-01-12HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback