WI AB912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.192 (1) (bm) and 238.18 of the statutes; Relating to: rural economic development programs administered by the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation, grants to other authorities and state agencies for purposes of rural economic development, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Rural economic development programs administered by the Wisconsin Economic Development Corporation, grants to other authorities and state agencies for purposes of rural economic development, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Representatives Spiros and Shankland added as coauthors |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:13 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-14 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 4 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 4) |
2018-02-14 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 3) |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Tranel |
2018-02-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Quinn |
2018-02-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tranel |
2018-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rural Development and Mining and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2018-02-08 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development and Mining |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced |