WI AB91 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 36.11 (3) (d) (intro.), 36.11 (47m) (title) and 38.12 (12) (title); and to create 36.11 (47m) (c) and 38.12 (12) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: exempting veterans and members of the armed forces from admissions application fees at University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)
Title
Exempting veterans and members of the armed forces from admissions application fees at University of Wisconsin System schools and technical colleges. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Revenue |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 2 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-10 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-09-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-09-07 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-06-22 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-06-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-06-08 | House | Representatives J. Anderson, O'Connor, Goeben and Michalski added as coauthors |
2023-06-05 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2023-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2023-03-08 | House | Introduced |