WI AB91 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 968.38 (2m) (intro.), 968.38 (2m) (a) and 968.38 (5) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: throwing or expelling a bodily substance at a public safety worker or prosecutor. (FE)
Title
Throwing or expelling a bodily substance at a public safety worker or prosecutor. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-06-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2021-03-19 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2021-03-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-11 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-05 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2021-03-03 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced |