WI AB887 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to affect 2021 Wisconsin Act 58, section 9104 (1) (g) 2g. and 2r.; Relating to: an addition to the 2021-23 Authorized State Building Program for the construction of additional columbarium units at the Southern Wisconsin Veterans Memorial Cemetery. (FE)
Title
An addition to the 2021-23 Authorized State Building Program for the construction of additional columbarium units at the Southern Wisconsin Veterans Memorial Cemetery. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 229 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 9:00 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2022-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-02-02 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2022-01-31 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2022-01-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced |