WI AB880 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 227.01 (13) (intro.), subchapter II (title) of chapter 227 [precedes 227.10], 227.11 (title), 227.53 (1) (intro.) and 227.57 (11); and to create 35.93 (2) (b) 3. im., 227.01 (3m), 227.10 (2g), 227.11 (3) and 227.112 of the statutes; Relating to: deference by courts to agency interpretations of law, notice and comment requirements for guidance documents issued by agencies, and agency rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Deference by courts to agency interpretations of law, notice and comment requirements for guidance documents issued by agencies, and agency rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-03-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque |
2018-02-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-02-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee for Review of Administrative Rules |
2018-01-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab880 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB880.pdf |