WI AB880 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 46.245, 69.186 (1) (hf), 69.186 (1) (k), 69.186 (1) (L), 253.09, 253.095, 253.10, 253.105, 253.107, 441.06 (6), 441.07 (1g) (f), 448.03 (5) (a), 457.26 (2) (gm), 632.8985 and 940.04; to renumber and amend 940.32 (1) (a) 10.; to amend 20.9275 (1) (a), 48.375 (4) (a) 1., 448.02 (3) (a), 625.11 (4), 625.22 (1), 628.34 (3) (b), 939.75 (2) (b) 1., 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a., 990.001 (17) (b) and 990.01 (19j) (b); to repeal and recreate 448.02 (3) (a); and to create 15.194 (2), 15.197 (12m), chapter 258, subchapter VIII (title) of chapter 655 [precedes 655.90], 655.90, 655.92, 655.94, 655.96 and 940.32 (1) (a) 11. of the statutes; Relating to: medically accurate information, conscientious beliefs of reproductive health care providers, health care provider liability insurance, eliminating certain abortion requirements, prohibiting employment retribution and discrimination, actions against a person seeking or providing health care, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Title
Medically accurate information, conscientious beliefs of reproductive health care providers, health care provider liability insurance, eliminating certain abortion requirements, prohibiting employment retribution and discrimination, actions against a person seeking or providing health care, and providing a criminal penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-02-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab880 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB880.pdf |