WI AB86 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 60.31 (3) (b) and 755.03 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the official bond requirements for town municipal judges. (FE)
Title
Changing the official bond requirements for town municipal judges. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Brooks [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 113 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2019-05-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-05-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced |