WI AB857 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 66.0825 (3) (h) and 196.491 (4) (c) 1.; to amend 30.025 (3m), 66.0303 (3) (a), 66.0825 (3) (e), 66.0825 (3) (f), 66.0825 (4) (a), 66.0825 (18), 196.491 (4) (c) 2., 196.491 (4) (c) 3., 706.09 (3) (a) and 893.33 (5); and to create 196.491 (4) (c) 1g. and 196.491 (4) (c) 1r. a. and b. of the statutes; relating to: exemption for interstate natural gas companies from certain requirements regarding real estate transactions and court actions, creation and powers of municipal electric companies, and exemption from certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain electric transmission line projects.
Title
Exemption for interstate natural gas companies from certain requirements regarding real estate transactions and court actions, creation and powers of municipal electric companies, and exemption from certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain electric transmission line projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 378 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-20 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-19 | Placed on calendar 4-20-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-19 | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m) | |
2010-04-19 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-19 | Withdrawn from committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 46 (2)(c) | |
2010-04-14 | Read first time and referred to committee on Commerce, Utilities, Energy, and Rail | |
2010-04-14 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-13 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-04-13 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-13 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on calendar 4-13-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-04-02 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-04-02 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-02 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Energy and Utilities | |
2010-03-30 | Executive action taken | |
2010-03-30 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-16 | Read first time and referred to committee on Energy and Utilities | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced |