WI AB835 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: House Government Accountability and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 15.193, 15.204, 20.435 (8) (b), 20.435 (8) (c), 20.435 (8) (kw), 20.435 (8) (o) and 20.435 (8) (p); to amend 13.90 (1) (intro.), 13.90 (1m) (a), 13.90 (1m) (b), 15.01 (6) and 20.765 (3) (g); and to create 13.94 (1d), 13.97, 20.765 (3) (cm), 20.765 (3) (kr), 20.923 (6) (fm) and 230.08 (2) (fr) of the statutes; Relating to: creating a legislative office of inspector general and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a legislative office of inspector general and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-03-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-03-02HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-27HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-21HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-21HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-21HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-20HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-17HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-31HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2020-01-30HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback