WI AB828 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 115.385 (1g) (a), 115.385 (1g) (b), 118.60 (11) (bm) and 119.23 (11) (bm); to renumber and amend 118.33 (1m) (a) 2., 118.60 (7) (an) and 119.23 (7) (an); to amend 115.385 (1g) (c) 3. c., 118.60 (7) (am) 1m. and 119.23 (7) (am) 1m.; and to create 115.787 (2) (em), 118.33 (1m) (a) 2. b., 118.60 (7) (am) 3., 118.60 (7) (an) 1., 119.23 (7) (am) 3. and 119.23 (7) (an) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: independent financial audits of private schools participating in a parental choice program, a civics exam as a condition for obtaining a high school diploma, and factors for determining school and school district performance on the school and school district accountability report.
Title
Independent financial audits of private schools participating in a parental choice program, a civics exam as a condition for obtaining a high school diploma, and factors for determining school and school district performance on the school and school district accountability report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-16 | House | Made a special order of business at 2:00 PM on 2-18-2016 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 5 |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2016-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-29 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab828 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB828.pdf |