WI AB818 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 703.28 (1); to renumber and amend 703.165 (2) and 703.28 (2); to amend 703.09 (1) (c), 703.09 (2), 703.095, 703.115 (1) (b), 703.12, 703.13 (6) (e), 703.13 (7) (c), 703.13 (8) (c), 703.15 (4) (d) 1., 703.165 (5) (intro.), 703.165 (5) (c), 703.18 (2) (a) and (b) and 703.22 (title), (2) and (3); and to create 703.09 (2m), 703.15 (4) (dm), 703.165 (2) (b), 703.167, 703.18 (2) (c), 703.28 (1m) (intro.), 703.28 (3) (intro.) and 703.28 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: various changes to condominium law and rights related to first mortgage security interests in condominium units.
Title
Various changes to condominium law and rights related to first mortgage security interests in condominium units.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Mike Kuglitsch [R] |
Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 333 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-03-30 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-30-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-13 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:10 PM on 2-15-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 |
2018-02-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-01-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2018-01-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2018-01-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2018-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2018-01-08 | House | Introduced |