WI AB790 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 609.896 and 632.895 (16w) of the statutes; Relating to: coverage of tests and ancillary procedures for services for which health insurance coverage is mandated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coverage of tests and ancillary procedures for services for which health insurance coverage is mandated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-02-20HouseRepresentative Emerson added as a coauthor
2023-12-13HouseCommissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
2023-12-08HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
2023-12-08HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback