WI AB79 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.563 (13) (b); and to create 29.235 (3r) and 29.563 (4) (a) 2w. of the statutes; Relating to: issuance of conservation patron licenses to certain veterans with disabilities. (FE)
Title
Issuance of conservation patron licenses to certain veterans with disabilities. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Horlacher |
2019-04-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2019-03-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab79 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB79.pdf |