WI AB786 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Published 4-5-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 165.967; to create 165.967 (2) of the statutes; and to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 763qb, 2015 Wisconsin Act 55, section 9426 (1q) and 2017 Wisconsin Act 59, sections 2265p and 9428 (1r) (b); Relating to: the Court Appointed Special Advocates grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Court Appointed Special Advocates grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HousePublished 4-5-2018
2018-04-05HouseReport approved by the Governor on 4-4-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 255
2018-04-03HousePresented to the Governor on 4-3-2018
2018-03-08HouseReport correctly enrolled on 3-8-2018
2018-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2018-02-20SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-20SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0
2018-02-20SenateRules suspended
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-20SenateRead a second time
2018-02-16SenatePlaced on calendar 2-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2018-02-16SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2018-02-14SenateSenator Darling added as a cosponsor
2018-02-14SenateAvailable for scheduling
2018-02-14SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2018-02-14SenateReceived from Assembly
2018-02-13HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2018-02-13HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 93, Noes 0
2018-02-13HouseRules suspended
2018-02-13HouseOrdered to a third reading
2018-02-13HouseRead a second time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on calendar 2-13-2018 by Committee on Rules
2018-02-08HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2018-02-08HouseReport passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2018-02-08HouseExecutive action taken
2018-02-02HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2018-02-02HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 7, Noes 0
2018-02-01HouseExecutive action taken
2018-01-30HousePublic hearing held
2017-12-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Family Law
2017-12-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback