WI AB775 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.113 (title), 302.113 (1), 302.113 (2), 302.114 (1), 303.065 (1) (b) 1., 304.02 (5), 304.06 (1) (b), 304.071 (2), 939.616 (1g), 939.62 (2m) (b) (intro.), 950.04 (1v) (gm), 950.04 (1v) (m), 973.01 (3), 973.01 (4), 973.014 (1) (intro.), 973.014 (1g) (a) (intro.), 973.15 (2m) (a) 1. and 978.07 (1) (c) 1.; and to create 973.014 (3), 973.017 (2c), 973.018 and 977.05 (4) (i) 10. of the statutes; Relating to: sentencing for crimes committed by a person who is under the age of 18. (FE)
Title
Sentencing for crimes committed by a person who is under the age of 18. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-06 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2020-02-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-24 | House | Senator Wirch added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab775 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB775.pdf |