WI AB774 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 51.01 (1); to amend 46.28 (1) (b), 49.45 (25) (am) 4., 51.37 (5) (a) and 51.37 (5) (b); and to create 51.01 (1d), 51.01 (8m), 51.37 (5) (bm) and 301.28 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: active psychosis and mental health treatment for prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Active psychosis and mental health treatment for prisoners.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-15HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2024-03-07HouseSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2024-02-22HouseLaid on the table
2024-02-22HouseRepresentative Rozar added as a coauthor
2024-02-21HouseRepresentative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
2024-02-20HouseMade a special order of business at 10:29 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28
2024-02-19HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2024-02-19HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2024-02-19HouseReport Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2024-02-19HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2024-02-19HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2024-02-14HouseExecutive action taken
2024-02-12HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Schraa
2024-02-06HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Schraa
2024-01-31HouseRepresentative Subeck added as a coauthor
2024-01-31HousePublic hearing held
2024-01-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa
2023-12-08HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
2023-12-08HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback