WI AB77 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 175.48 (3), 175.49 (2) (a) (intro.), 175.49 (2) (a) 2., 175.49 (2) (b) 1., 175.49 (2) (b) 2., 175.49 (2) (b) 3. a., 175.49 (2) (b) 5., 175.49 (3) (title), (a) (intro.), 1., 2. and 4., (b) and (c), 175.49 (5) and 941.23 (3) (b) 2. a.; and to create 175.49 (1) (em) and 175.49 (1) (i) of the statutes; Relating to: certification cards to carry concealed weapons for residents of Wisconsin who formerly were employed as law enforcement officers in another state and successor law enforcement agencies to assume responsibility of issuing certification cards to carry concealed weapons to former officers. (FE)
Title
Certification cards to carry concealed weapons for residents of Wisconsin who formerly were employed as law enforcement officers in another state and successor law enforcement agencies to assume responsibility of issuing certification cards to carry concealed weapons to former officers. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Mark Born [R] | Rep. James Edming [R] |
Rep. Bob Gannon [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. John Murtha [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
Rep. Jim Ott [R] | Rep. Christine Sinicki [D] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Sen. Richard Gudex [R] | Sen. Van Wanggaard [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 68 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-10-15 | Senate | Senator Stroebel added as a cosponsor |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Representative Tittl added as a coauthor |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | House | Representative Ripp added as a coauthor |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 89, Noes 10 |
2015-06-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Read a second time |
2015-06-03 | House | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 14, Noes 1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-28 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-04-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced |