WI AB74 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.17 (3) (d) 1g. of the statutes; Relating to: seasonal period for farm service license endorsement.
Title
Seasonal period for farm service license endorsement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-06-20 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2023-06-15 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-06-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-06-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2023-06-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Plumer |
2023-05-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-03-15 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2023-03-09 | House | Senator Pfaff added as a cosponsor |
2023-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced |